Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB270 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 3, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023

Amended

Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023