Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 26, 2023
Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023