Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB298 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 3, 2023
Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023