5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | LLS NO. M23-0687.01 Rebecca Hausmann x2172 |
---|
8 | 8 | | SJM23-002 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Senate Committees House Committees |
---|
10 | 10 | | SENATE JOINT MEMORIAL 23-002 |
---|
11 | 11 | | M |
---|
12 | 12 | | EMORIALIZING FORMER SENATOR JOHN (JACK) TAYLOR.101 |
---|
13 | 13 | | WHEREAS, John (Jack) W. Taylor, the former Senator, departed1 |
---|
14 | 14 | | this life on April 22, 2020, at the age of 84; and2 |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor was born in Chicago, Illinois, on3 |
---|
16 | 16 | | November 22, 1935, to Harvey and Pauline Taylor; and4 |
---|
17 | 17 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor grew up on a farm in Auburn, Iowa,5 |
---|
18 | 18 | | with his brother Robert before attending Iowa State University; and6 |
---|
19 | 19 | | WHEREAS, In college, Senator Taylor was in the Navy ROTC7 |
---|
20 | 20 | | program and played baseball, in which he excelled, being named All8 |
---|
21 | 21 | | Conference at second base and playing for the 1957 Iowa State University9 |
---|
22 | 22 | | varsity baseball team that won the Big 7 Conference Championship and10 |
---|
23 | 23 | | placed third in the College World Series in Omaha, Nebraska; and11 |
---|
36 | | - | Lukens, Amabile, Armagost, Bacon, Bird, Bockenfeld, Boesenecker, Bottoms, Brown, |
---|
37 | | - | Catlin, Daugherty, DeGraaf, deGruy Kennedy, Dickson, Duran, English, Evans, Frizell, |
---|
38 | | - | Froelich, Gonzales-Gutierrez, Hamrick, Hartsook, Jodeh, Joseph, Kipp, Lindsay, Lindstedt, |
---|
39 | | - | Luck, Lynch, Mabrey, Marshall, Martinez, McCluskie, McCormick, McLachlan, Michaelson |
---|
40 | | - | Jenet, Ortiz, Parenti, Pugliese, Ricks, Sharbini, Sirota, Snyder, Soper, Story, Taggart, Titone, |
---|
41 | | - | Valdez, Velasco, Vigil, Weinberg, Weissman, Willford, Wilson, Winter T., Woodrow, Young |
---|
| 33 | + | Lukens, |
---|
42 | 34 | | Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. |
---|
43 | 35 | | Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. |
---|
44 | 36 | | Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. WHEREAS, After college, Senator Taylor joined the Navy and1 |
---|
45 | 37 | | served on an icebreaker ship that participated in the International2 |
---|
46 | 38 | | Geophysical Year operation in Antarctica, an international scientific3 |
---|
47 | 39 | | project that lasted from July 1, 1957, to December 31, 1958; and4 |
---|
48 | 40 | | WHEREAS, After serving in the Navy, Senator Taylor moved to5 |
---|
49 | 41 | | New Orleans, Louisiana, where he worked for Boeing Aerospace on the6 |
---|
50 | 42 | | Apollo Moon Landing Project; and7 |
---|
51 | 43 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor also spent time in Kuwait, helping to8 |
---|
52 | 44 | | build and staff the country's first oil refinery before moving to Steamboat9 |
---|
53 | 45 | | Springs, Colorado, in 1969, where he established a real estate business10 |
---|
54 | 46 | | and became a partner in a small coal mining operation at Mount Harris;11 |
---|
55 | 47 | | and12 |
---|
56 | 48 | | WHEREAS, After moving to Steamboat Springs, Senator Taylor13 |
---|
57 | 49 | | met his wife, Geneva, whom he married in 1973; and14 |
---|
58 | 50 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor and Geneva had one daughter, Vicki,15 |
---|
59 | 51 | | and two grandchildren, Brianna and Dakin; and16 |
---|
60 | 52 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor served on several boards and17 |
---|
61 | 53 | | commissions, including the Soda Creek Ditch Board, before running for18 |
---|
62 | 54 | | the state legislature; and19 |
---|
63 | 55 | | WHEREAS, In 1992, Senator Taylor was elected to the Colorado20 |
---|
64 | 56 | | House of Representatives, where he served from 1993 to 2000, followed21 |
---|
65 | 57 | | by an eight-year term in the Colorado Senate from 2001 to 2008; and22 |
---|
66 | 58 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor was a well-respected and well-liked23 |
---|
67 | 59 | | statesman whose legislative career focused on support for the military,24 |
---|
68 | 60 | | wildlife, water, and telecommunications; and25 |
---|
69 | 61 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor sponsored 252 bills, memorials, and26 |
---|
70 | 62 | | resolutions in his 16 years in the legislature, 201 of which were enacted,27 |
---|
71 | 63 | | including bills on voting, tuition assistance for the National Guard,28 |
---|
72 | 64 | | petroleum storage tanks, creation of the Colorado tourism office, waste29 |
---|
73 | 65 | | tire recycling, and enterprise zones, among many others; and30 |
---|
74 | 66 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor served on the Agriculture and31 |
---|
75 | 67 | | Business committees in both the House and the Senate and was a member32 |
---|
76 | 68 | | 002 |
---|
77 | 69 | | -2- of the Legislative Audit Committee for 12 years; he also served on joint1 |
---|
78 | 70 | | Water committees for 10 years, the joint Police Officers' and Firefighters'2 |
---|
79 | 71 | | Pension Reform Commission for five years, and several interim3 |
---|
80 | 72 | | committees throughout his tenure; and4 |
---|
81 | 73 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor felt strongly that it was important to5 |
---|
82 | 74 | | fight for Western Slope water, vowing to protect water rights and6 |
---|
83 | 75 | | property rights; and7 |
---|
84 | 76 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor was also instrumental in providing8 |
---|
85 | 77 | | better telecommunications access in northwest Colorado; and9 |
---|
86 | 78 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor also loved working irrigation ditches10 |
---|
87 | 79 | | in his neighborhood and mowing the neighborhood Strawberry Park roads11 |
---|
88 | 80 | | and some neighbors' driveways with his John Deere tractor; and12 |
---|
89 | 81 | | WHEREAS, After serving in the General Assembly, one of13 |
---|
90 | 82 | | Senator Taylor's main activities was participating in the Republican Party,14 |
---|
91 | 83 | | chairing the Routt County Republican Party twice and partnering with his15 |
---|
92 | 84 | | wife, Geneva, to chair various Republican campaigns; and16 |
---|
93 | 85 | | WHEREAS, Senator Taylor and Geneva were a team, two17 |
---|
94 | 86 | | community leaders who complemented each other and were very strong18 |
---|
95 | 87 | | supporters of the community; and19 |
---|
96 | 88 | | WHEREAS, Geneva survived Senator Taylor, but passed away20 |
---|
97 | 89 | | just six months later on October 15, 2020; now, therefore,21 |
---|
98 | 90 | | Be It Resolved by the Senate of the Seventy-fourth General22 |
---|
99 | 91 | | Assembly of the State of Colorado, the House of Representatives23 |
---|
100 | 92 | | concurring herein:24 |
---|
101 | 93 | | That, in the death of Senator Jack Taylor, the people of the state25 |
---|
102 | 94 | | of Colorado have lost a devoted public servant and an outstanding citizen,26 |
---|
103 | 95 | | and that we, the members of the Seventy-fourth General Assembly, pay27 |
---|
104 | 96 | | tribute to Jack Taylor for his years of dedicated public service and do28 |
---|
105 | 97 | | hereby extend our deep and heartfelt sympathy to the members of his29 |
---|
106 | 98 | | family.30 |
---|
107 | 99 | | Be It Further Resolved, That a copy of this Joint Memorial be sent31 |
---|
108 | 100 | | to Senator Taylor's daughter and son-in-law, Vicki and Trent Bushner of32 |
---|
109 | 101 | | Yuma, Colorado; his granddaughter, Brianna Klamer; his grandson,33 |
---|
110 | 102 | | 002 |
---|
111 | 103 | | -3- Dakin Bushner; and his brother, Robert Taylor of Houston, Texas.1 |
---|
112 | 104 | | 002 |
---|
113 | 105 | | -4- |
---|