04/29/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
04/19/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |