Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 29, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2024

Amended

Bill March 1, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024