Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 3, 2024
Fiscal Note April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note January 11, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024