Page 1 June 5, 2024 HB 24-1046 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Final Fiscal Note Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 24-0347 Rep. Duran; Evans Sen. Kolker; Kirkmeyer Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: June 5, 2024 Signed into Law Aaron Carpenter | 303-866-4918 aaron.carpenter@coleg.gov Bill Topic: CHILD WELFARE SYSTEM TOOLS Summary of Fiscal Impact: ☐ State Revenue ☒ State Expenditure ☐ State Transfer ☐ TABOR Refund ☒ Local Government ☐ Statutory Public Entity The bill requires that reports of child abuse include any evidence of domestic violence or intimate partner violence, the child abuse hotline have a disclaimer that calls are recorded, and the Child Protection Ombudsman audit certain child welfare system tools. From FY 2024-25 through FY 2025-26, the bill increases state and local expenditures. Appropriation Summary: For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $109,392 to the Office of the Child Protection Ombudsman. Fiscal Note Status: The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill, which is recommended by the Colorado Child Welfare System Interim Study Committee Table 1 State Fiscal Impacts HB 24-1046 Budget Year FY 2024-25 Out Year FY 2025-26 Revenue - - Expenditures General Fund $109,392 $116,463 Centrally Appropriated $9,298 $7,439 Total Expenditures $118,690 $123,902 Total FTE 0.5 FTE 0.5 FTE Transfers - - Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $16,409 $17,469 Page 2 June 5, 2024 HB 24-1046 Summary of Legislation As described in more detail below, this bill requires that: reports for child abuse include any evidence of domestic violence; the child abuse hotline have a disclaimer that calls are recorded; and the Child Protection Ombudsman audit certain child welfare system tools. Reporting child abuse. The bill requires reports of known or suspected child abuse or neglect to include any evidence of known domestic violence or intimate partner violence, including past cases, in a child’s home whenever possible. The Colorado Department of Human Services (CDHS) must also review the screening process used by counties and hotline system operators and create a consistent screening process, which includes questions about domestic or intimate partner violence, for county departments to follow while responding to a report from the child abuse reporting hotline. Finally, the CDHS must develop a disclosure that notifies callers that calls to the child abuse reporting hotline are recorded. Audit of child welfare system tools. The bill requires the Colorado Child Protection Ombudsman (OCPO) to contract with a third party to conduct audits on the Colorado family safety assessment and the Colorado family risk assessment. The OCPO must report the results of the audit by March 1, 2026. State Expenditures The bill will increase General Fund expenditures in the OCPO by about $119,000 in FY 2024-25 and $124,000 in FY 2025-26 as shown in Table 2 and discussed below. In addition, workload in the CDHS will increase in FY 2024-25 only. Table 2 Expenditures Under HB 24-1046 FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 Child Protection Ombudsman Personal Services $37,798 $30,239 Operating Expenses $640 $512 Capital Outlay Costs $6,670 - Audit Contract $64,284 $85,712 Centrally Appropriated Costs 1 $9,298 $7,439 Total Costs $118,690 $123,902 Total FTE 0.5 FTE 0.5 FTE 1 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. Page 3 June 5, 2024 HB 24-1046 Child Protection Ombudsman. From FY 2024-25 through FY 2025-26, costs in the OCPO will increase to hire additional staff and to contract for the required audits, as described below. Staff. From FY 2024-25 through FY 2025-26, the OCPO requires 0.5 FTE to develop request for proposals, review the proposals, choose a third party administer, and to manage the contract with the third party administrator. Costs assume an August 1, 2024 start date, and includes standard operating and capital outlay expenses. Audit contract. Costs in the OCPO will increase to contract with a third-party administrator to conduct audits on the required tools outlined in the bill. The fiscal note estimates that contractor costs will be about $11,000 per month, with work starting on January 1, 2025 and finishing by March 1, 2026. This results in six months of costs in FY 2024-25 ($64,000) and eight months of cost in FY 2025-26 ($86,000). Department of Human Services. In FY 2024-25, workload to the CDHS will increase to update rules to reflect the requirements of the bill, update messaging/recordings for the child abuse hotline, and to provide information as needed to the auditor. This work can be accomplished within existing appropriations. Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. Other Budget Impacts General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. Local Government To the extent that county departments are involved with any of the audits, or if additional training is needed for screenings of domestic violence, workload to county departments of human services will increase. Effective Date This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 28, 2024. Page 4 June 5, 2024 HB 24-1046 State Appropriations For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $109,392 to the Office of the Child Protection Ombudsman, and 0.5 FTE. State and Local Government Contacts Child Welfare Counties Human Services Information Technology Law The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit: leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.