Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2024
Fiscal Note January 12, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2024

Amended

Bill May 6, 2024
Bill May 4, 2024