06/03/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/28/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Legislative Council | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |