Second Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REENGROSSED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted in the House of Introduction LLS NO. 24-0802.01 Shelby Ross x4510 HOUSE BILL 24-1086 House Committees Senate Committees Health & Human Services A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING THE OPERATION OF THE DENVER HEALTH AND HOSPITAL101 AUTHORITY.102 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) Current law requires the department of health care policy and financing (department) to offer to enter into a direct contract with the managed care organization (MCO) operated by or under the control of the Denver health and hospital authority (Denver health) until Denver health ceases to operate a medicaid managed care program or until June 30, 2025. The bill removes the option for the department to enter into a direct HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended February 5, 2024 HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading January 29, 2024 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Holtorf and Amabile, Bacon, Bird, Boesenecker, Brown, Clifford, deGruy Kennedy, Duran, Epps, Froelich, Hamrick, Hernandez, Herod, Jodeh, Lieder, Lindsay, Lindstedt, Mabrey, Martinez, Mauro, McCluskie, McCormick, Ortiz, Rutinel, Sirota, Snyder, Soper, Taggart, Titone, Valdez, Vigil, Weissman, Young SENATE SPONSORSHIP Michaelson Jenet, Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. contract until June 30, 2025, and instead requires the department to enter into the contract until Denver health ceases to operate a managed care program. The bill prohibits the MCO from reimbursing contracted medicaid providers at rates that are higher than the department's medicaid fee for service rates unless the provider enters into a quality incentive agreement with the MCO. The bill requires the MCO's contract to provide physical and behavioral health-care services to the population it serves. For the 2023-24 state fiscal year, the department distributed money appropriated for a supplemental state payment to Denver health. The bill authorizes the department to continually distribute any money appropriated for payment to Denver health. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. Legislative declaration. (1) The general assembly2 finds that:3 (a) Safety net hospitals are experiencing significant financial4 hardships due to uncompensated care, increased staffing costs, inflation,5 and federal money that is no longer available. Hospitals are seeing more6 uninsured, underinsured, and medicaid patients. Safety net hospitals are7 caring for patients longer, with less revenue and increased expenses, and8 they are struggling with how to provide care for their communities. Rural9 safety net hospitals and Denver health are the mostly heavily burdened by10 these increasing financial hardships.11 (b) Denver health and hospital authority is the largest safety net12 hospital in Colorado, serving patients from 63 out of the 64 counties in13 the state;14 (c) From 2020 to 2023, uncompensated care at Denver health has15 increased 127% due to underpayment from public insurance companies16 and increases in uninsured patients, including migrants and people17 experiencing homelessness;18 (d) In 2023, Denver health is projected to provide more than $13519 1086-2- million in uncompensated care;1 (e) Increased demand for services among uninsured and2 underinsured patients and increases in the number of homeless patients3 and those with a mental health diagnosis, together with the increasing4 expenses and stagnating public funding from federal, state, and local5 governments, have created an unsustainable financial situation for Denver6 health;7 (f) As a safety net hospital on the front line of providing8 health-care services statewide, it is important for the health of Coloradans9 that Denver health is financially stable and remains a valuable health-care10 resource; and11 (g) As the largest safety net hospital in Colorado, Denver health12 maintains and invests in administrative infrastructure necessary to carry13 out the responsibilities of serving a disproportionate share of medicaid14 members and uninsured individuals. Because of this, Denver health is15 unable to generate sufficient revenue to fulfill the ongoing investment16 need.17 (2) Therefore, the general assembly declares it is important to18 provide authority to the department of health care policy and financing to19 assist safety net hospitals, such as Denver health, in becoming financially20 stable.21 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 25.5-5-402, amend22 (7.5)(a) and (7.5)(b)(II) as follows:23 25.5-5-402. Statewide managed care system - rules -24 definitions - repeal. (7.5) (a) The state department shall offer to enter25 into a direct contract FOR PHYSICAL HEALTH-CARE SERVICES with the26 MCO operated by or under the control of Denver health and hospital27 1086 -3- authority, created pursuant to article 29 of title 25, until the MCO ceases1 to operate a medicaid managed care program or until June 30, 2025,2 unless sooner reprocured FROM JULY 1, 2025, UNTIL JUNE 30, 2032, AS3 LONG AS THE MCO MEETS ALL MCO CRITERIA REQUIRED BY THE STATE4 DEPARTMENT. If the state department designates an MCE OTHER THAN5 THE MCO OPERATED BY OR UNDER THE CONTROL OF DENVER HEALTH6 AND HOSPITAL AUTHORITY to manage behavioral health HEALTH-CARE7 services pursuant to this article 5, Denver health and hospital authority,8 or any subsidiary, thereof, shall collaborate with the MCO MCE during9 the term of contract.10 (b) The MCO operated by or under the control of Denver health11 and hospital authority shall:12 13 (II) Accept rates determined by the state department, through14 standard methodologies, to cover the population it is serving. R ATES PAID15 BY THE MCO TO CONTRACTED PROVIDERS MUST NOT BE HIGHER THAN THE16 STATE DEPARTMENT'S MEDICAID FEE FOR SERVICE RATES UNLESS THE17 PROVIDER ENTERS INTO A QUALITY INCENTIVE AGREEMENT WITH THE18 MCO.19 20 SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 25.5-4-42721 as follows:22 25.5-4-427. State payment to the Denver health and hospital23 authority. (1) The state department shall distribute money appropriated24 for a supplemental payment to the Denver health and hospital authority25 created in section 25-29-103.26 (2) This section is repealed, effective July 1, 2024.27 1086 -4- SECTION 4. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,1 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate2 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for3 the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state4 institutions.5 1086 -5-