Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1086 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 9, 2024
Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 5, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2024

Amended

Bill March 13, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024