Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1100 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0209.01 Jed Franklin x5484
HOUSE BILL 24-1100
House Committees Senate Committees
Transportation, Housing & Local Government Local Government & Housing
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING A REQUIREMENT THAT A CORONER BE CERTIFIED BY THE101
A
MERICAN BOARD OF MEDICOLEGAL DEATH INVESTIGATORS OR102
THE AMERICAN BO ARD OF 
PATHOLOGY IN FORENSIC103
PATHOLOGY.104
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
The bill requires a coroner of a county with a population greater
than 150,000 to be either a death investigator certified by and in good
standing with the American board of medicolegal death investigators or
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 26, 2024
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
March 25, 2024
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 20, 2024
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
February 16, 2024
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Vigil, Bacon, Boesenecker, Brown, Clifford, Daugherty, Froelich, Hamrick, Jodeh, Kipp,
Marshall, Marvin, McCluskie, Parenti, Sirota, Valdez, Willford
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Jaquez Lewis, Bridges, Gonzales, Priola, Winter F.
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. a forensic pathologist certified by and in good standing with the
American board of pathology (qualifications). County commissioners of
a county with a population of 150,000 or less may impose the
qualifications upon an affirmative majority vote of the commissioners.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 30-10-601.5, amend2
(1)(b) and (1)(c); and add (1)(d) as follows:3
30-10-601.5.  Qualifications - fingerprints. (1)  A person is4
eligible to hold the office of coroner if the person:5
(b)  Has earned a high school diploma or its equivalent or a college6
degree; and
7
(c)  Has given a set of fingerprints in accordance with subsection8
(2) of this section; 
AND9
(d) 
       FOR A CORONER ELECTED ON OR AFTER NOVEMBER 5, 2024,10
IN A COUNTY WITH A POPULATION GREATER THAN ONE HUNDRED FIFTY11
THOUSAND, IS A DEATH INVESTIGATOR CERTIFIED BY AND IN GOOD12
STANDING WITH THE AMERICAN BOARD OF MEDICOLEGAL DEATH13
INVESTIGATORS OR IS A FORENSIC PATHOLOGIST CERTIFIED BY AND IN14
GOOD STANDING WITH THE AMERICAN BOARD OF PATHOLOGY ; OR15
          16
SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act17
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the18
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except19
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V20
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this21
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take22
1100-2- effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in1
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the2
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.3
1100
-3-