Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2024
Fiscal Note March 15, 2024
Fiscal Note February 9, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 2, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill March 25, 2024