|
05/20/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/15/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reconsider - CCR produced
|
|
|
|
05/08/2024
|
First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|