Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 7, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2024
Bill May 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024