Second Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO INTRODUCED LLS NO. 24-0827.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348 HOUSE BILL 24-1144 House Committees Senate Committees Finance A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING THE CREATION OF AN INCOME TAX CREDIT FOR SELLERS101 OF RESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY THAT BUY DOWN THE102 MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE OF THE BUYER OF THE PROPERTY .103 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) The bill creates an income tax credit (tax credit) that is available for income tax years starting on or after January 1, 2024, but before January 1, 2026, for sellers of residential property in Colorado who buy down the interest rates on the mortgage of the buyer of the property. The amount of the tax credit is 50% of the cost of the mortgage interest rate HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Bockenfeld, SENATE SPONSORSHIP (None), Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. buy down. The tax credit is refundable and transferrable to any other taxpayer. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 39-22-560 as2 follows:3 39-22-560. Tax credit for mortgage rate buydowns - tax4 preference performance statement - legislative declaration -5 definitions - repeal. (1) (a) I N ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 39-21-304,6 WHICH REQUIRES EACH BILL THAT CREATES A NEW TAX EXPENDITURE TO7 INCLUDE A TAX PREFERENCE PERFORMANCE STATEMENT AS PART OF A8 STATUTORY LEGISLATIVE DECLARATION , THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY FINDS9 AND DECLARES THAT THE PURPOSES OF THE TAX CREDIT CREATED IN THIS10 SECTION ARE TO INDUCE CERTAIN DESIGNATED BEHAVIOR BY TAXPAYERS11 AND TO IMPROVE INDUSTRY COMPETITIVENESS BY ALLOWING A SELLER OF12 RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY THAT BUYS DOWN THE MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE13 OF THE BUYER OF THE PROPERTY TO CLAIM A TAX CREDIT . SPECIFICALLY,14 THIS TAX CREDIT IS INTENDED TO INCENTIVIZE PROPERTY OWNERS TO SELL15 THEIR RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY IN A WAY THAT BENEFITS HOME BUYERS BY16 REDUCING THEIR MORTGAGE INTEREST RATES AND TO STIMULATE THE17 REAL ESTATE MARKET.18 (b) T HE GENERAL ASSEMBLY AND THE STATE AUDITOR SHALL19 MEASURE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE TAX CREDIT IN ACHIEVING THE20 PURPOSES SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (1)(a) OF THIS SECTION BASED ON THE21 NUMBER AND VALUE OF TAX CREDITS CLAIMED AND ANY ADDITIONAL22 INFORMATION THAT IS MAINTAINED AND REPORTED TO THE STATE23 AUDITOR BY THE DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (6) OF THIS24 SECTION.25 HB24-1144-2- (2) AS USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE1 REQUIRES:2 (a) "B UY DOWN" MEANS PERMANENTLY REDUCING THE INTEREST3 RATE ON A MORTGAGE BY PAYING A LUMP SUM AT CLOSING TO SECURE A4 LOWER INTEREST RATE.5 (b) "D EPARTMENT" MEANS THE COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF6 REVENUE.7 (c) "H OMEBUYER" MEANS AN INDIVIDUAL WHO TAKES OUT A8 MORTGAGE TO BUY RESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY IN THE STATE THAT WILL9 BE USED AS THE INDIVIDUAL'S PRIMARY RESIDENCE.10 (d) "Q UALIFIED SELLER" MEANS AN INDIVIDUAL TAXPAYER WHO ,11 WHEN SELLING RESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY THAT THE TAXPAYER OWNS12 IN THE STATE, PROVIDES A BUY DOWN TO A HOMEBUYER .13 (e) "T AX CREDIT" MEANS THE CREDIT AGAINST INCOME TAX14 CREATED IN THIS SECTION.15 (f) "T AXPAYER" MEANS A PERSON SUBJECT TO TAX PURSUANT TO16 THIS ARTICLE 22.17 (3) (a) S UBJECT TO THE LIMITATIONS SET FORTH IN SUBSECTION18 (3)(b) OF THIS SECTION, FOR INCOME TAX YEARS COMMENCING ON OR19 AFTER JANUARY 1, 2024, BUT BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2026, A QUALIFIED20 SELLER IS ALLOWED A CREDIT AGAINST THE INCOME TAXES IMPOSED BY21 THIS ARTICLE 22 IN AN AMOUNT EQUAL TO FIFTY PERCENT OF THE LUMP22 SUM DOLLAR AMOUNT PAID BY THE QUALIFIED SELLER AT CLOSING TO BUY23 DOWN A HOMEBUYER 'S MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE.24 (b) T O CLAIM THE TAX CREDIT, A QUALIFIED SELLER SHALL SUBMIT25 INFORMATION TO THE DEPARTMENT , IN A FORM AND MANNER REQUIRED26 BY THE DEPARTMENT , THAT DETAILS THE QUALIFYING MORTGAGE27 HB24-1144 -3- INTEREST RATE BUY DOWN . IN ADDITION TO OTHER INFORMATION1 REQUIRED BY THE DEPARTMENT , THIS INFORMATION MUST INCLUDE:2 (I) T HE NUMBER OF PERCENTAGE POINTS BY WHICH THE INTEREST3 RATE OF THE MORTGAGE WAS REDUCED BY THE BUY DOWN ;4 (II) T HE DOLLAR AMOUNT OF THE LUMP SUM PAID AT CLOSING TO5 BUY DOWN THE MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE ; AND6 (III) E VIDENCE OF THE TRANSFER OF TITLE OF THE RESIDENTIAL7 PROPERTY FROM THE QUALIFIED SELLER TO THE HOMEBUYER .8 (4) I F THE AMOUNT OF THE TAX CREDIT EXCEEDS THE TAXES DUE9 ON THE INCOME OF THE QUALIFIED SELLER FOR THE TAXABLE YEAR FOR10 WHICH THE CREDIT IS BEING CLAIMED, THE QUALIFIED SELLER MAY ELECT11 TO HAVE THE AMOUNT OF THE CREDIT NOT USED TO OFFSET INCOME TAXES12 IN THAT INCOME TAX YEAR REFUNDED TO THE QUALIFIED SELLER .13 (5) A QUALIFIED SELLER MAY TRANSFER ALL OR A PORTION OF A14 TAX CREDIT ALLOWED PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (3) OF THIS SECTION TO15 ANOTHER TAXPAYER FOR THE OTHER TAXPAYER , AS TRANSFEREE, TO16 APPLY AS A CREDIT AGAINST THE TAXES IMPOSED BY THIS ARTICLE 2217 SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING LIMITATIONS :18 (a) T AX CREDIT TRANSFERS PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION (5)19 ARE SUBJECT TO ANY NOTICE AND VERIFICATION REQUIREMENTS20 DETERMINED BY THE DEPARTMENT ;21 (b) A QUALIFIED SELLER OR A TRANSFEREE MAY ONLY TRANSFER22 THE PORTION OF THE TAX CREDIT THAT HAS NOT BEEN APPLIED AGAINST23 THE INCOME TAXES IMPOSED BY THIS ARTICLE 22 OR USED TO OBTAIN A24 REFUND; AND25 (c) A NY TRANSFEREE OF A TAX CREDIT MAY USE THE AMOUNT OF26 THE TAX CREDIT TRANSFERRED TO OFFSET ANY OTHER TAX DUE UNDER27 HB24-1144 -4- THIS ARTICLE 22, OR THE TRANSFEREE MAY FREELY TRANSFER ANY1 PORTION OF THE TAX CREDIT THAT HAS NOT BEEN APPLIED AGAINST THE2 INCOME TAXES IMPOSED BY THIS ARTICLE 22 BY THE TRANSFEREE OR ANY3 OTHER TAXPAYER.4 (6) T HE DEPARTMENT SHALL MAINTAIN A DATABASE OF5 INFORMATION ABOUT THE NUMBER AND VALUE OF TAX CREDITS CLAIMED6 AND ANY OTHER INFORMATION DETERMINED NECESSARY BY THE7 DEPARTMENT TO EVALUATE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE TAX CREDIT8 ALLOWED IN THIS SECTION IN ACHIEVING THE PURPOSES SET FORTH IN9 SUBSECTION (1)(a) OF THIS SECTION AND SHALL PROVIDE THIS10 INFORMATION, AND ANY OTHER INFORMATION THAT MAY BE NEEDED , TO11 THE STATE AUDITOR AS PART OF THE STATE AUDITOR 'S EVALUATION OF12 TAX EXPENDITURES UNDER SECTION 39-21-305.13 (7) P URSUANT TO ARTICLE 4 OF TITLE 24, THE DEPARTMENT MAY14 PROMULGATE RULES FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THIS SECTION .15 (8) T HIS SECTION IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE DECEMBER 31, 2033.16 SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date -17 applicability. (1) This act takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following18 the expiration of the ninety-day period after final adjournment of the19 general assembly; except that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant20 to section 1 (3) of article V of the state constitution against this act or an21 item, section, or part of this act within such period, then the act, item,22 section, or part will not take effect unless approved by the people at the23 general election to be held in November 2024 and, in such case, will take24 effect on the date of the official declaration of the vote thereon by the25 governor.26 HB24-1144 -5- (2) This act applies to sales of residential real property that close1 on or after January 1, 2024.2 HB24-1144 -6-