Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1144 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 Second Regular Session
22 Seventy-fourth General Assembly
33 STATE OF COLORADO
44 INTRODUCED
55
66
77 LLS NO. 24-0827.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348
88 HOUSE BILL 24-1144
99 House Committees Senate Committees
1010 Finance
1111 A BILL FOR AN ACT
1212 C
1313 ONCERNING THE CREATION OF AN INCOME TAX CREDIT FOR SELLERS101
1414 OF RESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY THAT BUY DOWN THE102
1515 MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE OF THE BUYER OF THE PROPERTY .103
1616 Bill Summary
1717 (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
1818 not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
1919 passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
2020 applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
2121 http://leg.colorado.gov
2222 .)
2323 The bill creates an income tax credit (tax credit) that is available
2424 for income tax years starting on or after January 1, 2024, but before
2525 January 1, 2026, for sellers of residential property in Colorado who buy
2626 down the interest rates on the mortgage of the buyer of the property. The
2727 amount of the tax credit is 50% of the cost of the mortgage interest rate
2828 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
2929 Bockenfeld,
3030 SENATE SPONSORSHIP
3131 (None),
3232 Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
3333 Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
3434 Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. buy down. The tax credit is refundable and transferrable to any other
3535 taxpayer.
3636 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
3737 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 39-22-560 as2
3838 follows:3
3939 39-22-560. Tax credit for mortgage rate buydowns - tax4
4040 preference performance statement - legislative declaration -5
4141 definitions - repeal. (1) (a) I
4242 N ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 39-21-304,6
4343 WHICH REQUIRES EACH BILL THAT CREATES A NEW TAX EXPENDITURE TO7
4444 INCLUDE A TAX PREFERENCE PERFORMANCE STATEMENT AS PART OF A8
4545 STATUTORY LEGISLATIVE DECLARATION , THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY FINDS9
4646 AND DECLARES THAT THE PURPOSES OF THE TAX CREDIT CREATED IN THIS10
4747 SECTION ARE TO INDUCE CERTAIN DESIGNATED BEHAVIOR BY TAXPAYERS11
4848 AND TO IMPROVE INDUSTRY COMPETITIVENESS BY ALLOWING A SELLER OF12
4949 RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY THAT BUYS DOWN THE MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE13
5050 OF THE BUYER OF THE PROPERTY TO CLAIM A TAX CREDIT . SPECIFICALLY,14
5151 THIS TAX CREDIT IS INTENDED TO INCENTIVIZE PROPERTY OWNERS TO SELL15
5252 THEIR RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY IN A WAY THAT BENEFITS HOME BUYERS BY16
5353 REDUCING THEIR MORTGAGE INTEREST RATES AND TO STIMULATE THE17
5454 REAL ESTATE MARKET.18
5555 (b) T
5656 HE GENERAL ASSEMBLY AND THE STATE AUDITOR SHALL19
5757 MEASURE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE TAX CREDIT IN ACHIEVING THE20
5858 PURPOSES SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (1)(a) OF THIS SECTION BASED ON THE21
5959 NUMBER AND VALUE OF TAX CREDITS CLAIMED AND ANY ADDITIONAL22
6060 INFORMATION THAT IS MAINTAINED AND REPORTED TO THE STATE23
6161 AUDITOR BY THE DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (6) OF THIS24
6262 SECTION.25
6363 HB24-1144-2- (2) AS USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE1
6464 REQUIRES:2
6565 (a) "B
6666 UY DOWN" MEANS PERMANENTLY REDUCING THE INTEREST3
6767 RATE ON A MORTGAGE BY PAYING A LUMP SUM AT CLOSING TO SECURE A4
6868 LOWER INTEREST RATE.5
6969 (b) "D
7070 EPARTMENT" MEANS THE COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF6
7171 REVENUE.7
7272 (c) "H
7373 OMEBUYER" MEANS AN INDIVIDUAL WHO TAKES OUT A8
7474 MORTGAGE TO BUY RESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY IN THE STATE THAT WILL9
7575 BE USED AS THE INDIVIDUAL'S PRIMARY RESIDENCE.10
7676 (d) "Q
7777 UALIFIED SELLER" MEANS AN INDIVIDUAL TAXPAYER WHO ,11
7878 WHEN SELLING RESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY THAT THE TAXPAYER OWNS12
7979 IN THE STATE, PROVIDES A BUY DOWN TO A HOMEBUYER .13
8080 (e) "T
8181 AX CREDIT" MEANS THE CREDIT AGAINST INCOME TAX14
8282 CREATED IN THIS SECTION.15
8383 (f) "T
8484 AXPAYER" MEANS A PERSON SUBJECT TO TAX PURSUANT TO16
8585 THIS ARTICLE 22.17
8686 (3) (a) S
8787 UBJECT TO THE LIMITATIONS SET FORTH IN SUBSECTION18
8888 (3)(b)
8989 OF THIS SECTION, FOR INCOME TAX YEARS COMMENCING ON OR19
9090 AFTER JANUARY 1, 2024, BUT BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2026, A QUALIFIED20
9191 SELLER IS ALLOWED A CREDIT AGAINST THE INCOME TAXES IMPOSED BY21
9292 THIS ARTICLE 22 IN AN AMOUNT EQUAL TO FIFTY PERCENT OF THE LUMP22
9393 SUM DOLLAR AMOUNT PAID BY THE QUALIFIED SELLER AT CLOSING TO BUY23
9494 DOWN A HOMEBUYER 'S MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE.24
9595 (b) T
9696 O CLAIM THE TAX CREDIT, A QUALIFIED SELLER SHALL SUBMIT25
9797 INFORMATION TO THE DEPARTMENT , IN A FORM AND MANNER REQUIRED26
9898 BY THE DEPARTMENT , THAT DETAILS THE QUALIFYING MORTGAGE27
9999 HB24-1144
100100 -3- INTEREST RATE BUY DOWN . IN ADDITION TO OTHER INFORMATION1
101101 REQUIRED BY THE DEPARTMENT , THIS INFORMATION MUST INCLUDE:2
102102 (I) T
103103 HE NUMBER OF PERCENTAGE POINTS BY WHICH THE INTEREST3
104104 RATE OF THE MORTGAGE WAS REDUCED BY THE BUY DOWN ;4
105105 (II) T
106106 HE DOLLAR AMOUNT OF THE LUMP SUM PAID AT CLOSING TO5
107107 BUY DOWN THE MORTGAGE INTEREST RATE ; AND6
108108 (III) E
109109 VIDENCE OF THE TRANSFER OF TITLE OF THE RESIDENTIAL7
110110 PROPERTY FROM THE QUALIFIED SELLER TO THE HOMEBUYER .8
111111 (4) I
112112 F THE AMOUNT OF THE TAX CREDIT EXCEEDS THE TAXES DUE9
113113 ON THE INCOME OF THE QUALIFIED SELLER FOR THE TAXABLE YEAR FOR10
114114 WHICH THE CREDIT IS BEING CLAIMED, THE QUALIFIED SELLER MAY ELECT11
115115 TO HAVE THE AMOUNT OF THE CREDIT NOT USED TO OFFSET INCOME TAXES12
116116 IN THAT INCOME TAX YEAR REFUNDED TO THE QUALIFIED SELLER .13
117117 (5) A
118118 QUALIFIED SELLER MAY TRANSFER ALL OR A PORTION OF A14
119119 TAX CREDIT ALLOWED PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (3) OF THIS SECTION TO15
120120 ANOTHER TAXPAYER FOR THE OTHER TAXPAYER , AS TRANSFEREE, TO16
121121 APPLY AS A CREDIT AGAINST THE TAXES IMPOSED BY THIS ARTICLE 2217
122122 SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING LIMITATIONS :18
123123 (a) T
124124 AX CREDIT TRANSFERS PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION (5)19
125125 ARE SUBJECT TO ANY NOTICE AND VERIFICATION REQUIREMENTS20
126126 DETERMINED BY THE DEPARTMENT ;21
127127 (b) A
128128 QUALIFIED SELLER OR A TRANSFEREE MAY ONLY TRANSFER22
129129 THE PORTION OF THE TAX CREDIT THAT HAS NOT BEEN APPLIED AGAINST23
130130 THE INCOME TAXES IMPOSED BY THIS ARTICLE 22 OR USED TO OBTAIN A24
131131 REFUND; AND25
132132 (c) A
133133 NY TRANSFEREE OF A TAX CREDIT MAY USE THE AMOUNT OF26
134134 THE TAX CREDIT TRANSFERRED TO OFFSET ANY OTHER TAX DUE UNDER27
135135 HB24-1144
136136 -4- THIS ARTICLE 22, OR THE TRANSFEREE MAY FREELY TRANSFER ANY1
137137 PORTION OF THE TAX CREDIT THAT HAS NOT BEEN APPLIED AGAINST THE2
138138 INCOME TAXES IMPOSED BY THIS ARTICLE 22 BY THE TRANSFEREE OR ANY3
139139 OTHER TAXPAYER.4
140140 (6) T
141141 HE DEPARTMENT SHALL MAINTAIN A DATABASE OF5
142142 INFORMATION ABOUT THE NUMBER AND VALUE OF TAX CREDITS CLAIMED6
143143 AND ANY OTHER INFORMATION DETERMINED NECESSARY BY THE7
144144 DEPARTMENT TO EVALUATE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE TAX CREDIT8
145145 ALLOWED IN THIS SECTION IN ACHIEVING THE PURPOSES SET FORTH IN9
146146 SUBSECTION (1)(a) OF THIS SECTION AND SHALL PROVIDE THIS10
147147 INFORMATION, AND ANY OTHER INFORMATION THAT MAY BE NEEDED , TO11
148148 THE STATE AUDITOR AS PART OF THE STATE AUDITOR 'S EVALUATION OF12
149149 TAX EXPENDITURES UNDER SECTION 39-21-305.13
150150 (7) P
151151 URSUANT TO ARTICLE 4 OF TITLE 24, THE DEPARTMENT MAY14
152152 PROMULGATE RULES FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THIS SECTION .15
153153 (8) T
154154 HIS SECTION IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE DECEMBER 31, 2033.16
155155 SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date -17
156156 applicability. (1) This act takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following18
157157 the expiration of the ninety-day period after final adjournment of the19
158158 general assembly; except that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant20
159159 to section 1 (3) of article V of the state constitution against this act or an21
160160 item, section, or part of this act within such period, then the act, item,22
161161 section, or part will not take effect unless approved by the people at the23
162162 general election to be held in November 2024 and, in such case, will take24
163163 effect on the date of the official declaration of the vote thereon by the25
164164 governor.26
165165 HB24-1144
166166 -5- (2) This act applies to sales of residential real property that close1
167167 on or after January 1, 2024.2
168168 HB24-1144
169169 -6-