Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 12, 2024
Fiscal Note March 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 16, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024
Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2024

Amended

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024