Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1175 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 10, 2024
Fiscal Note February 12, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill April 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024