Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1231 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/24/2024

                    Page 1 
July 24, 2024  HB 24-1231 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0196  
Rep. Young; Daugherty 
Sen. Kirkmeyer; Mullica  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 24, 2024 
Signed into Law  
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
matt.bishop@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: STATE FUNDING FOR HIGHER EDUCATION PROJECTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill directs the State Treasurer to execute a lease-purchase agreement to fund 
certain capital construction projects. It makes a one-time transfer from the General 
Fund in FY 2023-24, increases state revenue in FY 2024-25 only, and increases state 
expenditures beginning in FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. See State Appropriations section. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1231 
  
Current Year 
FY 2023-24 
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2027-28 
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-     $247.0 million     	-     
Expenditures General Fund 	-     -     up to $17.5 million     
 	Cash Funds 	-     $247.0 million 	-     
Transfers 	General Fund ($41.3 million) 	-  	-  
 	Cash Funds $41.3 million    
Other Budget Impacts GF Reserve 	-  	- up to $2.6 million 
   Page 2 
July 24, 2024  HB 24-1231 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill directs the State Treasurer to execute a lease-purchase agreement of about $247 million 
by December 31, 2024, to fund capital construction projects related to health care education. 
The bill describes conditions for the issuance, including the limitation for annual state-funded 
payments, which begin in FY 2027-28. The funds raised by the issuance will be used for: 
 construction of the College of Osteopathic Medicine at the University of Northern Colorado; 
 construction of the Health Institute Tower at Metropolitan State University of Denver; 
 construction of the Veterinary Health Education Complex at Colorado State University; and 
 renovation of the Valley Campus Main Building at Trinidad State College. 
More information on these capital projects may be found here. 
Senate Bill 22-056 authorized UNC to create a college and offer degrees in osteopathic 
medicine. As a condition of accreditation, the university must retain funds in escrow that can be 
used to reimburse students if the new program becomes unable to award degrees. The bill 
creates the College of Osteopathic Medicine Escrow Money Cash Fund and transfers the 
required amount to the new fund. When the money is released from escrow to the university, 
the amount of state support it receives that fiscal year is reduced by the same amount. 
Background 
The state enters into lease-purchase agreements using financial instruments called certificates of 
participation (COPs). In this type of lease-purchase agreement, the state transfers its interests in 
a property to a lessor in exchange for cash and then leases the property back through annual 
lease payments. The lessor assigns its interests to a trustee, usually a commercial bank, who 
holds the title to the property, collects lease payments from the state, and makes payments to 
the investors. The state renews the lease each year and makes annual payments authorized 
through the Long Bill. The interest rate paid by the state is fixed and depends on market 
conditions at the time COPs are priced for sale. When the lease ends, the state owns the facility 
at no or minimal additional cost. 
State Revenue 
In FY 2024-25, the bill increases state revenue by $246,936,092 from issuance of the COPs. 
Favorable market conditions may result in more revenue being received. The revenue generated 
will be deposited in specific cash funds for state institutions of higher education. This revenue is 
not subject to TABOR. 
State Transfers 
The bill transfers $41,250,000 from the General Fund to the College of Osteopathic Medicine 
Escrow Money Cash Fund on June 30, 2024.   Page 3 
July 24, 2024  HB 24-1231 
 
 
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures for capital projects and for lease payments on the COP. 
Capital projects. In FY 2024-25, state expenditures will increase in the Department of Higher 
Education by the amount of revenue generated by the issuance, which is anticipated to be $247 
million. The amount each department expects to expend is shown in Table 2 below. Cash fund 
contributions reflect institutional funds and cash spending authority beyond the funds raised by 
the COP issuance will require additional legislative approval. 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1231 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 Total 
Univ. of Northern Colorado $34,691,428 $86,473,500 $6,377,100 $127,542,028 
Colorado State University $50,000,000   $50,000,000 
   additional cash funds $49,999,991 $44,000,001  $93,999,992 
Metro. State Univ. of Denver $8,433,652 $26,196,979 $15,369,369 $50,000,000 
   additional cash funds  $15,000,000  $15,000,000 
Trinidad State College $6,337,816 $13,056,248  $19,394,064 
  	Subtotal—COP  $246,936,092 
  Subtotal—Additional CF $108,999,992 
  	Grand Total $355,936,084 
For informational purposes, the total costs for the projects based on the institutions’ FY 2024-25 
capital budget requests are shown in Table 3 on the following page. State funds reflect the 
Capital Construction Fund, which is typically funded by an annual transfer from the General 
Fund. Cash Funds represent institutional revenue. Out-year costs not covered by the COP 
revenue will be addressed through the annual budget process. 
Lease payments. The fiscal note assumes that payments on principal and interest, pursuant to 
the lease-purchase agreement, will begin in FY 2027-28. The bill limits such payments to 
$17.5 million. 
   Page 4 
July 24, 2024  HB 24-1231 
 
 
 
Table 3 
Capital Project Costs 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
State Appropriations  
While the bill does not require an appropriation, it adds an informational notation to capital 
construction appropriations indicating the anticipation that $246,936,092 will be received 
through the COP and spent by institutions of higher education as shown in Table 2. 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 1, 2024. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Governor        Higher Education    Joint Budget Committee Staff 
Legislative Council Staff    Treasury  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.  
 
 	Fund Source FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 
University of Northern Colorado State Funds $126,266,608 -    -    
 	Cash Funds $1,275,420 -    -    
Colorado State University State Funds $25,000,000 $25,000,000 -    
 	Cash Funds $74,999,991 $19,000,001 -    
Metropolitan State University of 
Denver 
State Funds $8,960,824 $27,834,505 $16,330,081 
Cash Funds -    $5,903,479 -    
Trinidad State College 	State Funds $6,337,816 $13,056,248 -    
 	Cash Funds -    -    -    
Total Cost $242,840,659 $90,794,233 $16,330,081 
 Total State Funds $166,565,248 $65,890,753 $16,330,081 
 Total Cash Funds $76,275,411 $24,903,480 -    
 Grand Total (all years) $349,964,973