Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 24, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2024

Amended

Bill April 26, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024