Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 24, 2024
Fiscal Note April 26, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024