05/28/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/23/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2024 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |