Senate | 04/30/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |