Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 22, 2024
Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Fiscal Note March 14, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024