Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 13, 2024
Fiscal Note April 11, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill April 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024