Page 1 June 28, 2024 HB 24-1329 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Final Fiscal Note Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 24-0557 Rep. Bird; Lindstedt Sen. Marchman Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: June 28, 2024 Signed into Law Clayton Mayfield | 303-866-5851 clayton.mayfield@coleg.gov Bill Topic: SUNSET ARCHITECTS ENGINEERS & LAND SURVEYORS Summary of Fiscal Impact: ☒ State Revenue ☒ State Expenditure ☐ State Transfer ☒ TABOR Refund ☐ Local Government ☐ Statutory Public Entity Sunset bill. This bill continues the State Board of Licensure for Architects, Professional Engineers, and Professional Land Surveyors in the Department of Regulatory Agencies, which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2024. State fiscal impacts include only the continuation of the program’s current revenue and expenditures. The program is continued through September 1, 2033. Appropriation Summary: No appropriation is required. Fiscal Note Status: The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. Table 1 State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1329 1 New Impacts Budget Year FY 2024-25 Out Year FY 2025-26 Revenue - - Expenditures - - Continuing Impacts Revenue Cash Funds - $1,488,099 Expenditures Cash Funds - $1,343,696 Continuing FTE - 3.2 FTE Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund - $1,488,099 1 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill and the continuing impacts from extending the program beyond its current repeal date. Changes under the bill will not have a fiscal impact in the program. The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is not passed and the program is allowed to repeal. Page 2 June 28, 2024 HB 24-1329 Summary of Legislation The bill continues the State Board of Licensure for Architects, Professional Engineers, and Professional Land Surveyors in the Department of Regulatory Agencies (DORA), which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2024, for nine years, until September 1, 2033. The bill also makes changes to the program, including: adding failure to respond to the board regarding complaints as a grounds for discipline; updating references to names of professional examinations; allowing noncitizens and nonresidents to be board members; and repealing references regarding the Occupational Credential Portability Program. The full sunset report can be found here. Continuing Program Impacts Based on recent appropriations, DORA is expected to have revenue of about $1.5 million and expenditures of about $1.3 million to administer the program. If this bill is enacted, current revenue and expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2025-26. This continuing revenue is subject to the state TABOR limits. If this bill is not enacted, the program will end on September 1, 2024, following a wind-down period, and state revenue and expenditures will decrease starting in FY 2025-26 by the amounts shown in Table 1. The changes to the program do not drive additional revenue and costs. Effective Date The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 3, 2024, and takes effect on August 7, 2024, assuming no referendum petition is filed. State and Local Government Contacts Regulatory Agencies The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.