Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1329 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 28, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 26, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024