Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 24, 2024
Fiscal Note March 28, 2024
Fiscal Note March 21, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill April 4, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill April 22, 2024