Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1372 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/10/2024

                    Page 1 
April 9, 2024  HB 24-1372 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated March 28, 2024)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0696  
Rep. Woodrow; Herod 
Sen. Fields; Gonzales  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 9, 2024 
House Appropriations  
Aaron Carpenter | 303-866-4918 
aaron.carpenter@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: REGULATING LAW ENFORCEMENT USE OF PRONE RESTRAINT  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☒ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires law enforcement agencies to adopt a policy on prone restraint and to 
train officers on that policy. The bill increases state, local, and statutory public entity 
workload on an ongoing basis.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the House Judiciary 
Committee. 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires any Colorado law enforcement agency that employs a Peace Officer Standards 
and Training (POST) Board certified peace officer, sheriffs, and the Colorado State Patrol (law 
enforcement entities) to adopt written policies and procedures concerning the use of the prone 
position and prone restraint by July 1, 2025, and post it on its website. The bill specifies what the 
policies and procedures must include. Each law enforcement entity must review and update 
policies and procedures at least every five years.  
The POST Board in the Department of Law is required to make a training on the use of the 
prone position available to law enforcement agencies in the state. By July 1, 2026, law 
enforcement entities must implement and train their peace officers on the provisions of their 
adopted policies and procedures. 
State Expenditures 
The bill will increase workload in the Department of Law, the Department of Public Safety, state 
agencies employing POST-certified peace officers, and the Judicial Department. These impacts 
are discussed below. 
Department of Law. The department will have an increase in workload in the POST Board and 
to provide legal services to state agencies.  Page 2 
April 9, 2024  HB 24-1372 
 
 
 
 POST Board. In FY 2025-26, the bill increases workload in the POST Board to develop a 
training on the use of the prone position. It is estimated that development of the training 
will require 80 hours of staff time, which can be accomplished within existing resources. The 
fiscal note assumes that the required training will not generate additional complaints against 
peace officers.  
 Legal services. Starting in FY 2026-27, the department may have an increase in workload to 
represent any state agencies in violation of the bill. The fiscal note assumes high compliance; 
therefore, this workload can be accomplished within existing resources. 
Colorado State Patrol and other state agencies employing peace officers. Starting in 
FY 2024-25, workload in state agencies employing POST-certified peace officers will increase to 
create new policies and procedures, and to train officers. This workload can be handled within 
existing training resources for each affected agency, which primarily includes Colorado Parks 
and Wildlife, institutions of higher education, and the departments of Corrections, Public Safety 
and Revenue. 
Judicial Department. Starting in FY 2026-27, to the extent there are additional civil cases 
brought against peace officers as a result of the bill, workload to trial courts will increase. Any 
increase in workload for the trial courts is expected to be minimal.  
Local Government and Statutory Public Entities  
Similar to the state, workload for local governments, such as municipalities and counties, and 
statutory public entities, such as the Regional Transportation District, will increase to create new 
policies and procedures, and to train officers.   
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Corrections     District Attorneys    Higher Education    
Human Services    Judicial       Law        
Natural Resources    Personnel      Public Safety    
Revenue  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.