Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 25, 2024
Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Fiscal Note March 29, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2024
Bill April 19, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2024

Amended

Bill May 2, 2024