Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1445 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 1, 2024
Fiscal Note April 23, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 15, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill April 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2024

Amended

Bill May 2, 2024
Bill May 1, 2024