06/03/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/17/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 04/26/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |