Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1456 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/17/2024

                    Page 1 
July 17, 2024  HB 24-1456 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-1158  
Rep. Marvin, Daugherty 
Sen. Michaelson Jenet  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 17, 2024 
Signed into Law 
Kristine McLaughlin | 303-866-4776 
kristine.mclaughlin@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: INCREASE SYPHILIS TESTING DURING PREGNANCY  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires the Department of Public Health and Environment to promulgate 
rules concerning syphilis testing for pregnant patients. The bill minimally increases 
workload on an ongoing basis. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
Current law requires health care providers to test pregnant patients for syphilis at the first 
prenatal care visit, unless the patient refuses. The bill requires CDPHE to adopt rules regarding 
syphilis testing by January 1, 2025, and to update these rules every three years.  
Background and Assumptions 
On April 18, 2024 the Department of Public Health and Environment CDPHE issued Public Health 
Order (PHO) 24-01, which mandates additional syphilis testing during a third trimester prenatal 
care visit and during delivery. The fiscal note assumes that CDPHE will not raise requirements 
beyond this level as a result of the bill. 
State Expenditures 
Workload will minimally increase in CDPHE to promulgate rules every three years concerning 
syphilis testing of pregnant patients. This workload is absorbable within current resources. 
   Page 2 
July 17, 2024  HB 24-1456 
 
 
 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on June 5, 2024. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Health Care Policy and Financing    Public Health and Environment  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.