Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 17, 2024
Fiscal Note April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note April 20, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024