Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 30, 2024
Bill April 26, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 5, 2024