06/03/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
05/23/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | ||
House | 05/05/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/04/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |