Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1472 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 10, 2024
Bill May 5, 2024
Fiscal Note May 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2024
Bill May 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill May 7, 2024