Senate | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/23/2024 - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |