Senate | 04/19/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2024 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |