Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HR1006 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/04/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
INTRODUCED
LLS NO. R24-0905.01 Nicole Myers x4326	HR24-1006
House Committees
Judiciary
HOUSE RESOLUTION 24-1006 
C
ONCERNING THE IMPEACHMENT OF COLORADO SECRETARY OF STATE101
J
ENA GRISWOLD.102
WHEREAS, Pursuant to section 1 of article XIII of the Colorado1
Constitution, the House of Representatives has the power of2
impeachment; and3
WHEREAS, Colorado Secretary of State Jena M. Griswold under4
article XIII is subject to impeachment for high crimes or misdemeanors5
or malfeasance in office; and6
WHEREAS, In the case of Anderson v. Griswold, 2023 CO 63,7
No. 2023SA300 (CO S. Ct. Dec. 19, 2023), a decision was rendered by8
a majority of the Colorado Supreme Court Justices to prohibit former9
President and current candidate for president Donald J. Trump from being10
placed on the Colorado Republican presidential primary ballot because he11
was deemed to be disqualified under section 3 of the 14th Amendment to12
the United States Constitution from seeking the presidency for allegedly13
engaging in insurrection on January 6, 2021; and14
WHEREAS, The Colorado Supreme Court's order was contrary to15
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Armagost and Pugliese,  Bottoms, Bradfield, Bradley, Catlin, DeGraaf, Evans, Frizell,
Hartsook, Holtorf, Lynch, Soper, Taggart, Weinberg, Wilson, Winter T.
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. the United States Constitution, the Colorado Constitution, the Supreme1
Court Justices' oaths of office, the Colorado Revised Statutes, and public2
policy, and the Justices of the Colorado Supreme Court acted contrary to3
the public interest; and4
WHEREAS, Secretary Griswold publicly stated in a press release5
dated December 28, 2023, that "Donald Trump engaged in insurrection6
and was disqualified under the Constitution from the Colorado Ballot.7
The Colorado Supreme Court got it right."; and8
WHEREAS, Secretary Griswold publicly stated on the social9
media platform X on December 22, 2023, "I agree with the Colorado10
Supreme Court's ruling - insurrectionists like Donald Trump shouldn't be11
eligible for office."; and12
WHEREAS, Such actions constitute malfeasance in office,13
dereliction of duty, unfitness for office, and abuse of the public trust; and14
WHEREAS, To protect the citizens of Colorado from the threat of15
any future denials of constitutional rights, it is appropriate for Secretary16
Griswold to be impeached and removed from office; now, therefore,17
Be It Resolved by the House of Representatives of the18
Seventy-fourth General Assembly of the State of Colorado:19
That the House of Representatives adopts the following Articles20
of Impeachment against Colorado Secretary of State Jena M. Griswold:21
ARTICLE I22
For malfeasance in office for denying President Trump the right23
to due process of law guaranteed by the 5th Amendment to the United24
States Constitution and section 25 of article II of the Colorado25
Constitution by making public statements about President Trump's guilt26
for engaging in an insurrection when he has not, in any court of law, been27
found guilty of engaging in the alleged insurrection on January 6, 2021.28
ARTICLE II29
For malfeasance in office for denying a free and open election30
guaranteed by section 5 of article II of the Colorado Constitution and31
denying Coloradans the right to vote for their choice for president by32
HR24-1006
-2- preventing President Trump from being listed as a candidate on1
Colorado's Republican primary ballot in 2024.2
ARTICLE III3
For malfeasance in office for playing partisan politics in her office4
as the Secretary of State of Colorado, which should remain neutral and5
unbiased as the state's chief elections officer, by making public statements6
about President Trump and the Colorado Supreme Court's decision.7
ARTICLE IV8
For malfeasance in office for violating the United States9
Constitution, the Colorado Constitution, her oath of office, the Colorado10
Revised Statutes, and public policy by acting contrary to the public11
interest.12
ARTICLE V13
For malfeasance in office for demonstrating her unfitness for14
office by engaging in misconduct that will disrupt the 2024 Republican15
primary election in Colorado.16
ARTICLE VI17
For malfeasance in office for abusing the public trust and18
prejudicing the public's confidence in the Colorado Secretary of State's19
office and the state's elections system by misusing her official powers in20
a manner calculated to subvert the lawful operation of the Colorado21
Secretary of State's office to obstruct the fair and impartial administration22
of justice.23
Be It Further Resolved, That said Articles of Impeachment be duly24
enrolled and signed by the Speaker of this House of Representatives and25
that the Speaker appoint a Committee of Managers, consisting of five26
members of this House of Representatives, to exhibit such Articles of27
Impeachment before the Senate of the Seventy-fourth General Assembly28
in the name of this House of Representatives and of all of the people of29
the State of Colorado, and to conduct the prosecution of said Articles of30
Impeachment before said Senate in accordance with the provisions of the31
Colorado Constitution and of the rules of the Senate relating to the trial32
of impeachment.33
HR24-1006
-3- Be It Further Resolved, That a message be sent to the Senate to1
inform the members that this House of Representatives has appointed said2
Committee of Managers to conduct the impeachment against Colorado3
Secretary of State Jena M. Griswold.4
HR24-1006
-4-