03/22/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
03/21/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/21/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/24 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/08/24 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |