Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 18, 2024
Fiscal Note January 17, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill May 3, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024