Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB016 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 5, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2024

Amended

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024