Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB025 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 20, 2024
Fiscal Note January 11, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill April 5, 2024