|
04/11/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
04/04/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
House Considered Senate Adherence - Result was to Adhere
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|