|
06/05/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/16/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
|
|
|