Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB076 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 1, 2024
Fiscal Note May 7, 2024
Fiscal Note May 1, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2024

Amended

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024