LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB113
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB113
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
July 2, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 22, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 8, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 16, 2024
Bill
February 5, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 19, 2024
Compare
Bill
April 18, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 14, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 6, 2024
Compare
Bill
May 5, 2024
Compare